26TH COLCHESTER 1ST SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running scout association registered scout group working with youngsters aged 6yrs to 18yrs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 26 May 1994: Standard registration
- 26TH COLCHESTER SEA SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMY JANE FOWLER | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jan-Christoph Lawlor | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yuen Yan Law | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE LAWLOR | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Brown | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CALLUM LEONARD | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Le-Plongeon | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Jay | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.75k | £34.79k | £7.56k | £8.15k | £10.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.08k | £6.19k | £10.22k | £11.23k | £10.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 December 2024 | 405 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
POLICY, ORGANISATION AND RULES OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIRWAYS
LAYER ROAD
COLCHESTER
CO2 9LA
- Phone:
- 01206866995
- Email:
- tony.jay2@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window