Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF TAUNTON CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1038293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.63k £24.51k £29.48k £18.37k £11.10k
Total expenditure £13.75k £15.57k £33.18k £19.01k £13.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.10k N/A