Financial history BOURNEMOUTH NORTH DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £11.95k £3.66k £2.48k £14.54k £21.52k
Total expenditure £23.41k £7.53k £714 £9.89k £24.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A