Accounts and annual returns MANSFIELD MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 August 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required