Financial history 1ST STREET SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1040087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.43k £22.24k £16.74k £10.60k £9.97k
Total expenditure £6.84k £6.48k £6.70k £11.17k £10.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £631 £19.67k £11.67k N/A N/A