THE PERCY AND LILY REED WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1040132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity tends to support charitable projects either very close to home - mainly in mid-Cornwall where these tend to be of a cultural nature - or in the developing world, where we tend to concentrate on the relief of poverty by supporting small-scale community projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £51,183
Total expenditure: £14,883

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • PERCY AND LILY REED WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Percival Ross WILLIAMS Chair
BORLASE SMART JOHN WELLS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
MIRACLE THEATRE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
HEARTLANDS TRUST
Charity is in administration
PENWITH GALLERIES LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CORNUBIAN ARTS AND SCIENCE TRUST
Received: On time
CORNWALL MEDIA RESOURCE LIMITED
Received: On time
TAMSYN MARY WILLIAMS Trustee
ST IVES COMMUNITY FUND
Received: On time
SARAH WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £200.90k £118 £369 £80.91k £51.18k
Total expenditure £4.89k £3.10k £9.40k £33.75k £14.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Pendriggy
West Trewirgie Road
Redruth
TR15 2TJ
Phone:
01209 204450
Website:

No information available