ETHOS GROUP OSWESTRY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of specialist transitional housing for the severely disabled with appropriate advocacy services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £125,750 from 1 government contract(s) and £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 August 1994: Standard registration
- 12 August 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TRANS-HOUSE (Working name)
- ETOS GROUP OSWESTRY (Previous name)
- TRANS HOUSE (OSWESTRY) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.72k | £185.24k | £203.52k | £234.64k | £156.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.35k | £208.15k | £210.38k | £188.67k | £215.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £124.25k | £102.82k | £125.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.16k | £20.16k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 22 NOVEMBER 1993 AND BY A SPECIAL RES AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF PHYSICAL DISABILITY (IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE WITH SPINAL CORD INJURIES) BY SUPPORTING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN MAINSTREAM SOCIETY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) FACILITATING OPPORTUNITIES TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY, THROUGH PROVIDING SAFE AND APPROPRIATE ACCOMMODATION AND SPECIALIST SUPPORT SERVICES, ADVOCACY AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window