Financial history ASHFORD HILL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1040559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.79k £7.43k £8.22k £9.04k £9.69k
Total expenditure £1.74k £2.90k £3.20k £3.05k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A