ASHFORD HILL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives donations to people of all ages for Educational and recreational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 06 September 1994: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 July 2011: Re-registered
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 June 2016: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PENNY STEWART | Chair | 10 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Julian Craig Sunley | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick Enfield Taylor | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Derek Mellor | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR BOB LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.79k | £7.43k | £8.22k | £9.04k | £9.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74k | £2.90k | £3.20k | £3.05k | £3.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20 FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS, RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF ASHFORD HILL WITH HEADLEY OR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ASHFORD WITH HEADLEY OR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THER
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINNESOTA
ASHFORD HILL ROAD
HEADLEY
THATCHAM
RG19 8AB
- Phone:
- 01635269596
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window