NOTTINGHAM AND COUNTY CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports Registered Childminders throughout the county of Nottinghamshire including the city of Nottingham. The charity provides training and events to promote childminding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 September 1994: Standard registration
- NCCMA (Working name)
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAZEL GREENSMITH | Chair | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Annette Carraher | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Danvers | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Whilaker | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bains | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WILKINSON | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY JANE DOCHERTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE ANNE CHESTER-STIRLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE NYBLEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Pamela Jane Holland | Trustee |
|
||||||
SANDRA CHRISTINE COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £503 | £752 | £228 | £187 | £276 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £2.11k | £1.09k | £871 | £922 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED 11 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PARTICULARLY CHIDREN UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHT YEARS AND TO PROMOTE GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHERS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN PARTICULARLY THOSE UNDER EIGHT AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE AND RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
THE CITY AND COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Fulford Avenue
Retford
DN22 7XS
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- hazeldocherty@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window