Financial history CAMBRIDGE SPORT LAKES TRUST

Charity number: 1040693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £343.23k £559.73k £493.06k £521.29k £429.45k
Total expenditure £373.07k £396.61k £469.69k £495.51k £521.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £9.32k £7.44k
Income from government grants £6.00k £158.95k £80.09k £27.93k £7.16k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £20.03k N/A £41.29k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £539.70k N/A £480.00k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £396.61k N/A £495.51k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £22.79k N/A £74.87k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A