Financial history COMMUNITY HOUSING AND THERAPY

Charity Number: 1040713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.78m £3.15m £2.83m £3.44m £3.94m
Total expenditure £2.87m £3.08m £2.96m £3.24m £3.72m
Income from government contracts £1.54m £2.16m £2.20m £3.15m £3.80m
Income from government grants N/A £96.34k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.09k £43.46k £15.91k £124.78k £100.78k
Income - Other trading activities £15.83k £0 £0 £10.70k £8.80k
Income - Charitable activities £2.75m £2.97m £2.65m £3.29m £3.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £11.25k £133.56k £167.17k £15.88k £33.39k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.83m £3.03m £2.94m £3.18m £3.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.51k £45.99k £20.57k £57.46k £39.76k
Expenditure - Governance £127.55k £68.13k £67.92k £68.27k £74.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £17.70k £0 £0 £0 £38.91k