NEWCASTLE BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Newcastle upon Tyne and in particular people of Bangladeshi origin without distinction of sex, political, religious or other opinions, by associating together the said inhabitants and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,529 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 20 September 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAHTAB MIAH | Chair | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jeba Begum | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mojir Siddique | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shakir Alam Quraishi | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Azmol Hussain | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHAH MOYNUL HOQUE | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIRAJ MIAH | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
HUMAYUN CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AHSANUZ ZAMAN | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL RAHIM | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHAHAN CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLIUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sufi Ahmed | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|||||
ABDUL BOSHAR | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.14k | £75.03k | £228.65k | £243.93k | £135.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.31k | £29.84k | £339.27k | £238.68k | £94.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAY 2005 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE (HEREAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE OF BANGLADESHI ORIGIN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS 2.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE 2.3 TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND CULTURAL TRADITIONS OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE 2.4 TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER OBJECTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
246-248 ELSWICK ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 6SN
- Phone:
- 07803204748
- Email:
- sirajmiah2011@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window