Financial history THE MARGARET BEAUFORT INSTITUTE OF THEOLOGY

Charity Number: 1041031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £666.05k £554.09k £893.18k £3.82m £636.00k
Total expenditure £477.62k £467.20k £506.05k £605.28k £481.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.84k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £511.49k £323.59k £596.32k £54.25k £136.19k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £147.93k £224.85k £282.97k £306.47k £62.95k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.61k £4.02k £4.66k £165.69k £433.02k
Income - Other £1.02k £1.64k £9.23k £3.29m £3.85k
Income - Legacies £66.30k £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £439.71k £451.90k £488.61k £527.17k £426.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.04k £4.33k £7.21k £3.70k £39.84k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £7.63k £7.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.87k £10.97k £10.23k £74.41k £15.29k