THE WYKEHAM CROWN AND MANOR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financing facilities for the education and recreation of young persons in London and elsewhere to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their condition of life may be improved in particular by supporting the Crown and Manor Club, Hoxton and other clubs affiliated to the NABC Clubs for Young People
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
Governance
- 13 October 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anna Ackary Stone | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Mark Uvedale Lambert | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Christopher Normand | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Ralph Delano Cornell | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Anthony Ian Doolittle | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW JAMES SABBEN-CLARE | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
GUY BRYCE DAVISON | Trustee | 19 March 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.05k | £49.09k | £41.78k | £38.87k | £40.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.72k | £30.86k | £42.42k | £86.16k | £85.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/06/2011
Charitable objects
1.TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON AND ELSEWHERE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE CROWN AND MANOR CLUB, HOXTON, AND THE WOODBERRY DOWN BOYS' CLUB AND ANY OTHER CLUBS AFFILIATED TO THE NABC CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE OR RUN IN CONFORMITY WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND AIMS OF THE SAIS ASSOCIATION AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2.TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crown and Manor Club
1-12 Wiltshire Row
London
N1 5DH
- Phone:
- 02077395906
- Email:
- guy.davison111@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window