Financial history CAPTAIN SYDNEY ASHTON MORGAN TRUST

Charity number: 1041870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.24k £2.87k £3.05k £2.40k £3.63k
Total expenditure £1.85k £3.20k £5.09k £2.58k £3.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A