Trustees THAXTED CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1042077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donald Stephen Odom Trustee 28 February 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THAXTED
Received: On time
Mary Phyllis Carter Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Nicholas John Elcombe Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Richard Till Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Rev Christopher Brown Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
SUZANNE COMPAGNONI Trustee 13 February 2016
None on record
PETRINA MARGARET MAWER Trustee 13 February 2016
None on record
TOM WILSON Trustee 13 February 2016
None on record
BRUCE MUNRO Trustee
The Gibson Library Society
Received: On time