Financial history THE ELISHA SMITH INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1042374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.23k £4.12k £8.63k £5.68k £6.48k
Total expenditure £25.89k £4.12k £8.63k £5.62k £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.39k N/A N/A N/A N/A