Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE READING
Charity number: 1042542

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Linda Baines | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|||||||
Marcia Francesca Macdonald-Spiers | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|||||||
Nicolette Barton | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Ilham Dahmani Fikry | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Oluwakemi Odubanjo | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Natasha Suann Faye HAMILTON-MARTIN | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jacquelin BENTON | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Ronald Curtis | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW EDGER | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.