Accounts and annual returns THE BEVERLEY ROAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043239
Charity reporting is overdue by 1521 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 425 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 425 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 791 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 791 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1156 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1156 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1521 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1521 days