Financial history THE WYMONDHAM BRIDEWELL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1043569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £52.87k £42.75k £45.27k £47.05k £46.38k
Total expenditure £77.19k £15.80k £24.98k £30.14k £56.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A