Financial history HABITAT FOR HUMANITY GREAT BRITAIN

Charity Number: 1043641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.60m £1.50m £2.61m £3.05m £3.55m
Total expenditure £2.37m £1.51m £2.54m £2.88m £3.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £940.06k £516.71k £728.43k £898.35k £1.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.65m £987.08k £1.89m £2.15m £2.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.38k £52 £134 £3.14k £36.58k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £105.75k £66.52k £119.88k £143.69k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.93m £1.14m £2.10m £2.41m £3.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £442.38k £369.94k £439.85k £474.33k £507.89k
Expenditure - Governance £54.43k £0 £16.14k £18.82k £291.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £973.38k £612.11k £1.49m £1.08m £1.47m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0