Financial history POTTERY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1043887
Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £23.64k £32.57k £10.08k £22.71k £30.84k
Total expenditure £31.29k £31.09k £10.51k £20.02k £36.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A