OVERTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for Overton Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Middleton | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Thomas Corden | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Clare Proud | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Brady | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Louise Ferguson | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ilze Aletta Van Eck | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Burton | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iona Owen | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joy Thorley | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Pinfield | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Warriss-Simmons | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheldon Jowett | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Haddon | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|||||
FIONA WYETH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.28k | £12.76k | £9.82k | £28.70k | £22.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.95k | £7.48k | £4.78k | £9.55k | £43.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 1994 as amended on 27 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Overton C Of E Primary School
Court Drove
Overton
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG25 3ES
- Phone:
- 01256 770249
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window