Financial history THE FRIENDS OF HAPPISBURGH LIGHTHOUSE

Charity number: 1044590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.79k £5.64k £16.23k £20.58k £23.07k
Total expenditure £28.42k £4.91k £13.98k £20.77k £19.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A