Financial history DONCASTER SCHOOLS WORKER TRUST

Charity number: 1044784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.18k £48.58k £36.61k £87.86k £29.94k
Total expenditure £39.36k £43.62k £39.02k £42.35k £45.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.91k £8.21k N/A N/A