Financial history MONEY ADVICE AND COMMUNITY SUPPORT SERVICE

Charity number: 1045340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.22m £1.29m £1.40m £1.61m £1.70m
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.29m £1.40m £1.60m £1.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £974.62k £885.91k £966.14k £979.54k £1.05m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.37k £2.62k £5.91k £4.66k £2.87k
Income - Other trading activities £2.34k £37 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.28m £1.39m £1.60m £1.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.56k £482 £1.43k £619 £2.79k
Income - Other £0 £5.01k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.26m £1.37m £1.55m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.03k £19.92k £17.52k £36.47k £18.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £29.98k £32.69k £29.25k £52.54k £35.35k