Financial history ESSENDINE VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1045351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.00k £5.39k £13.09k £10.43k £11.04k
Total expenditure £9.33k £2.36k £8.85k £10.31k £10.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £2.67k N/A N/A