Trustees Let's Talk Well

Charity Number: 1045429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Hitchings Chair 23 April 2024
None on record
John Mark Dorrington Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Sharonrose Manhiri Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Hannah Coppard Trustee 17 February 2025
None on record
Katie Endacott Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Nicola Moore Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
THOKOZANI OWINO Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Caroline Edie-Treloar Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Joanna Mary Newton Trustee 18 January 2017
None on record
Nigel Gabb Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record