WAVENEY ENTERPRISES WORKSHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day Service (craft Workshop) for adults with a learning disability. Arts and Crafts activities in a person centered supported environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,792 from 2 government contract(s) and £800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 07 April 1995: Standard registration
- WAVENEY ENTERPRISES (Working name)
- WAVENEY ENTERPRISES CRAFT WORKSHOP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET JOHN | Chair | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Mason | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mason | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Katherine Coote | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Rake | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Munro | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jula Aldred-Wright | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.63k | £119.84k | £93.03k | £81.70k | £80.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.84k | £88.99k | £103.16k | £102.33k | £102.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £90.39k | £107.79k | £81.96k | £67.15k | £61.79k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £800 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 1995, AMENDED 4TH JUNE 2001 as amended on 18 Mar 2020 as amended on 30 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN THE WAVENEY VALLEY AND IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE WORKSHOP THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
WAVENEY VALLEY AND IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 SMALLGATE
BECCLES
SUFFOLK
NR34 9AB
- Phone:
- 01502 716065
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window