THE MIDI MUSIC COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Midi Music Company is a registered charity/company limited by guarantee, providing a space for all children and young people aged five to thirty to be inspired to get into music and the creative industries. MMC's team includes experienced industry professionals who deliver cutting edge creative and inspiring projects, enriching the artistic process for those who are socially disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,592 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 April 1995: Standard registration
- M M C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISTAIR GORDON WILLIAMS | Chair | 14 November 1994 |
|
|
||||
Claire Shomade | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Anthony Lyn | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Charles Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Indunil Aruni Vidyalankara | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Newman | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERAINT WYNNE HOWELLS | Trustee | 26 September 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.81k | £240.60k | £231.41k | £217.43k | £223.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.61k | £219.43k | £244.49k | £216.48k | £235.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.20k | £39.20k | £38.20k | £30.00k | £30.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1994 AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING ALL FORMS OF PERFORMING AND VISUAL ART WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE ART OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 WATSONS STREET
DEPTFORD
LONDON
SE8 4AU
- Phone:
- 02086946093
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window