CRESSAGE SCHOOL P T A

Charity Number: 1046078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund Raising for Christ Church Primary School, Cressage.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 19 September 2023

Total income: £3,626
Total expenditure: £832

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isobel Trow Chair 21 October 2024
None on record
Charlotte Morris Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 19/09/2022 19/09/2023
Total gross income £9.70k £3.46k £1.10k £4.81k £3.63k
Total expenditure £6.41k £4.98k £3.03k £4.27k £832
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 September 2023 13 November 2024 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 19 September 2022 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 September 2022 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 April 2021 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O CHRIST CHURCH C E SCHOOL
SHEINTON ROAD
CRESSAGE
SHREWSBURY
SY5 6DH
Phone:
01952510383
Website:

No information available