Financial history SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL NAVY SUBMARINE MUSEUM

Charity number: 1046251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.42k £30.85k £82.64k £190.72k £54.86k
Total expenditure £8.11k £26.46k £15.67k £60.22k £55.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A