Financial history BUXTON CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP

Charity number: 1046267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.44k £13.86k £22.10k £21.13k £17.93k
Total expenditure £26.71k £17.90k £18.66k £30.42k £13.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A