MOUNTAIN TRAINING ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Principal activity is the advancement for the public benefit of education and training in the skills required for the conduct of safe mountain walking and supervision of rock climbing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 1995: Standard registration
- MOUNTAIN LEADER TRAINING BOARD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Stacey | Chair | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee John Pritchard | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kelvyn Justin Simon James | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Sharon Jane Kennedy | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Doyle | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Corris Wright | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.33k | £261.97k | £297.21k | £351.19k | £361.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.59k | £277.68k | £301.94k | £328.99k | £365.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/05/1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/08/2015 as amended on 22 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING (IN CONJUCTION WHERE APPROPRIATE WITH OTHER BODIES OR PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR THE BRITISH MOUNTAINEERING COUNCIL AND THE UK MOUNTAIN TRAINING BOARD) IN THE SKILLS REQUIRED FOR THE CONDUCT OF SAFE MOUNTAINWALKING; AND (B) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE MEMBERS SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOUNTAIN TRAINING ENGLAND
Siabod Cottage
Capel Curig
BETWS-Y-COED
LL24 0ES
- Phone:
- 01690720314
- Email:
- info@mountain-training.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window