THE ABBEY ROAD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Abbey Road Centre (Canolfan Abbey Road) is a community resource centre providing support, information and resources to promote better mental health. Support may be accessed via befriending and counselling, workshops and training, activities and complimentary therapies. We host other relevant organisations who deliver their services on site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £142,799 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 16 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Wynn Jones | Chair | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nia Young | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sylvette Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Rowlinson Cllr | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL MARTIN | Trustee | 15 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD JOHN JONES | Trustee | 12 November 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.39k | £173.00k | £181.15k | £163.31k | £184.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.50k | £156.00k | £164.98k | £178.14k | £184.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £130.00k | £33.89k | £36.22k | £142.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.89k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 30 NOV 2023 as amended on 11 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS,INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS, IN THE COUNTY OF GWYNEDD. 3.2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF GWYNEDD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABBEY ROAD CENTRE
5-9 ABBEY ROAD
BANGOR
LL57 2EA
- Phone:
- 01248354888
- Email:
- arc@abbeyroadcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window