SWINDON THERAPY CENTRE FOR MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An inclusive charity dedicated to helping people lead happy, healthy, independent lives. Primarily known for supporting those with neurological conditions, some therapies help other conditions too. The Centre provides practical therapies, including hyperbaric oxygen, physio-led gym, exercise, yoga, pilates and tai chi classes, counselling and social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 19 June 1995: Standard registration
- Neuro Wellbeing Centre (Working name)
- S T C (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Paul Culling | Chair | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Keppel | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wells | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Clayton | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.90k | £253.97k | £202.32k | £201.33k | £217.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.78k | £179.41k | £319.96k | £278.90k | £279.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDOM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 1995 as amended on 01 Apr 2022 as amended on 01 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity (the "Object") is the relief of sickness and, in particular, the relief of persons with multiple sclerosis and other neurological conditions, by the provision of a therapy centre.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 1
BRADBURY HOUSE
WESTMEAD DRIVE
SWINDON
WILTS
- Phone:
- 01793481700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window