Financial history THE LEVY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1048182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £53.59k £336 £0 £25 £0
Total expenditure £26.37k £10.00k £3.00k £4.75k £7.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A