Financial history MERSEYSIDE PLAY ACTION COUNCIL

Charity number: 1048263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 29/03/2023 29/03/2024
Total gross income £363.15k £586.20k £750.02k £1.20m £2.00m
Total expenditure £390.57k £532.38k £564.51k £1.03m £1.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £615.28k N/A £1.26m
Income from government grants £200.44k £295.44k £60.44k £957.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £8.16k £67.41k £36.71k £51.43k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £46.29k £21.01k £133.61k £108.56k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £491.74k £615.28k £964.11k £1.79m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £1.41k £0
Income - Investment N/A £40.02k £46.33k £65.37k £56.98k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £484.89k £543.78k £1.01m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £47.50k £20.72k £17.10k £20.61k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £9.48k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £279.89k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £2.20k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0