Bodmin & District Horizons

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES FOR CLUB MEMBERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 July 1995: Standard registration
- BODMIN AND DISTRICT GATEWAY CLUB (Previous name)
- BODMIN AND DISTRICT HORIZON CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Jackson | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angie Honey | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Askew | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pearce | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rowse | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Willcock | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Crowe | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.56k | £26.93k | £31.02k | £34.49k | £41.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.38k | £29.40k | £28.10k | £31.62k | £43.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOV 1994 AS AMENDED ON 26 OCT 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 NOV 2020 as amended on 30 Sept 2024 as amended on 30 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CLUB ARE TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE LOCALITY OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF ANY LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT... TO ADVANCE THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF PEOPLE WHO HAPPEN TO HAVE A LEARNING DISABILITY THOUGH GREATER LEISURE OPPORTUNITIES BY PROMOTING PERSONAL CHOICE AND INDEPENDENCE AND ENCOURAGING THEIR FULL PARTICIPATION, INTEGRATION AND INVOLVEMENT IN THE CLUB AND COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Downalong Cottage
West Downs
DELABOLE
PL33 9DY
- Phone:
- 01840213871
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window