Financial history EVERDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1048340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/06/2020 19/06/2021 19/06/2022 19/06/2023 19/06/2024
Total gross income £5.93k £1.76k £8.91k £18.76k £17.18k
Total expenditure £3.52k £2.68k £15.28k £12.12k £30.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A