PENGARTH TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity Number: 1048718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of recorded newspaper to blind and partially sighted residents of Penzance and West Penwith

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 August 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL CLARK Chair
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Received: 14 days late
SHEKINAH CHRISTIAN CHURCH PENZANCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROTARY SHOP OF PENZANCE
Received: On time
PENGARTH DAY CENTRE
Received: 20 days late
Cornelius Olivier Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
Geoffrey Roberts Trustee 21 January 2014
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Received: 14 days late
Christopher Goninan Trustee 21 January 2014
None on record
CLIVE HARROLD Trustee 05 January 2012
PENGARTH DAY CENTRE
Received: 20 days late
PENWITH GATEWAY CLUB
Received: On time
WEST CORNWALL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Received: 14 days late
GOOD OLD FURNITURE AVAILABLE (GOFA)
Received: On time
CAROLYN JANE ROWE Trustee
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Received: 14 days late
MIKE COTTON Trustee
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF WEST CORNWALL HOSPITAL
Received: On time
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Received: 14 days late
PENWITH AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PENGARTH
MORRAB GARDENS
PENZANCE
TR18 4DA
Phone:
01736364307
Website:

No information available