Financial history THE CARERS' RESOURCE

Charity number: 1049278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.70m £3.75m £4.19m £4.62m £4.43m
Total expenditure £3.72m £3.73m £4.19m £4.69m £5.10m
Income from government contracts £2.12m £2.14m £2.70m £2.44m £2.68m
Income from government grants £463.63k £418.81k £434.71k £34.02k £270.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £112.50k £75.92k £85.72k £119.27k £154.58k
Income - Other trading activities £5.24k £856 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.58m £3.67m £4.11m £4.50m £4.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £261 £20 £20 £22 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £45.98k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.68m £3.70m £4.16m £4.66m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.28k £26.75k £29.88k £32.16k £5.45k
Expenditure - Governance £6.37k £0 £6.26k £7.02k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0