Financial history CHESS VALLEY MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1049289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.48k £9.37k £8.86k £11.73k £37.78k
Total expenditure £12.03k £10.46k £9.39k £11.74k £17.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A