COCOA - CARE OF CHINA'S ORPHANED AND ABANDONED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cocoa's mission is to improve the conditions for babies and children in China's orphanages and through foster care schemes by enhancing their quality of care and providing equipment, medicine and trained staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- China
Governance
- 06 October 1995: Standard registration
- 20 April 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 April 2015: Funds transferred to 1068349 INTERNATIONAL CHINA CONCERN
- THE DYING ROOMS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.29k | £56.63k | £50.86k | £51.68k | £47.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.20k | £87.07k | £58.45k | £54.68k | £92.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 19 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 19 March 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 16 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 16 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 07 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 18 February 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 06 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 09 February 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE PLIGHT OF CHILDREN IN NEED IN STATE ORPHANAGES IN THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AND OTHER TREATMENTS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION
Area of benefit
PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window