Financial history THE WORCESTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1049504
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £62.50k £50.05k £23.02k £0 £5.09k
Total expenditure £58.63k £61.05k £47.47k £1.93k £27.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £17.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £55.00k £36.99k £0 N/A N/A