Financial history WALFORD MILL EDUCATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1049540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £81.83k £93.22k £71.98k £85.57k £97.85k
Total expenditure £57.77k £59.40k £61.01k £64.11k £84.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.06k £67.23k £21.39k £10.00k £10.00k