THE SIR JOHN HOWARD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Education Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 05 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD ALAN HOWARD | Chair |
|
||||||
James Hodgson | Trustee | 23 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER KEMP HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.05k | £3.58k | £7.79k | £8.69k | £10.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £9.98k | £31.00k | £10.95k | £8.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14TH SEPTEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT THE BEDFORD SCHOOL AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES AND WITHOUY PREJUDICE TO THIS GENERAL DISCRETION THE FOUNDER EXPRESSES THE WISH THAT THERE SHOULD BE PROVIDED FREE OR ASSISTED PLACES TO PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL OF PARENTS WITH LIMITED MEANS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nashs Farm House
Luddenham
FAVERSHAM
Kent
ME13 0TQ
- Phone:
- 01235533278
- Email:
- rahoward@waitrose.com
- Website:
-
.none
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window