Financial history THE HOLFORD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1049719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.49k £4.84k £4.01k £4.37k £4.99k
Total expenditure £4.88k £5.75k £5.19k £5.68k £5.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A