Financial history CIRENCESTER AND DISTRICT GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity number: 1050096
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £2.25k £2.28k £1.78k £1.77k £1.60k
Total expenditure £1.85k £2.29k £1.16k £434 £1.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A